# MENTAL MATH 1 Online Test

35x35=

45X45

65X65=

75X75=

95X95

Description:

Test is helpful for Banks,CAT,SAT,MAT exams.Those taking this test should strictly adhere to the rules mentioned.I will be taking classes to discuss the questions asked in these tests and teach different tricks as well. Good Luck............................................................................................................................................................................................................................................

Tags:

Discussion

thank u neethu, hats off for the tech, but what if 125*125 ?

1514 days 4 hours 31 minutes ago

technique is like ...take an example 65*65....6*7(next digit of6)=42 ; 5*5=25...
so 4225....///ly 75 * 75........7*8=56 ; 5*5=25...so 5625..and so on

1769 days 12 hours 54 minutes ago

gud1.bt really wannna knw d trick behind dis..

1773 days 14 hours 45 minutes ago

i like it i want to know the technique used

1775 days 16 hours 8 minutes ago

it was a gud test.

1776 days 3 hours 54 minutes ago

AMIT KUMAR JHA
Online Maths teacher ( K/12) and Motivator
20 Members Recommend
158 Followers